Clinton's chief of staff
WebMar 31, 2003 · Ricchetti, Clinton’s Deputy Chief of Staff, started Ricchetti Inc., where he was joined by one of his former aides, Jay Heimbach. In its first year, the firm lured heavyweight clients such as General Motors Corp., AT&T, Siemens Corp., Eli Lilly & Co., Pharmacia Corp. and Fannie Mae. WebChief of Staff Took office Left office Time in office Party President 1 Steelman, JohnJohn Steelman (1900–1999) December 12, 1946 January 20, 1953 6 years, 39 days Democratic Truman, HarryHarry S Truman (Democratic) (1945 – 1953) 2 Adams, ShermanSherman Adams (1899–1986) January 20, 1953 October 7, 1958 5 years, 260 days Republican
Clinton's chief of staff
Did you know?
WebAug 23, 2024 · Jeff Lewis was appointed as Chief of Staff to the Governor on Sept. 8. He had previously served under then Lt. Gov. Hochul as her Director of External Affairs and … WebFeb 14, 2024 · Embed. Transcript. NPR's Mary Louise Kelly speaks with Leon Panetta, chief of staff for President Bill Clinton, and former Secretary of Defense and Director of the CIA under President Obama. He ...
WebJan 20, 1993 · CLINTON'S CABINET Bill Clinton has assembled the most diverse Cabinet in history: five women, four blacks and two Latinos. But with 13 lawyers among the … WebCharlie Baker: A longtime Democratic strategist, Baker acted as the campaign's chief administrative officer. Marc Elias: Elias was the campaign's general counsel. Dennis …
Mack McLarty, a long-time friend of Clinton who had led a successful business career and had served as the chairman of the Arkansas Democratic Party, became Clinton's first chief of staff. Clinton convinced Lloyd Bentsen, a longtime Senator from Texas and the 1988 Democratic vice presidential nominee, to serve as his first Secretary of the Treasury. At the start of Clinton's first term, … WebClinton years Podesta in 1993 Podesta served as both an Assistant to the President and as Deputy Chief of Staff. Earlier, from January 1993 to 1995, he was Assistant to the President, Staff Secretary and a senior policy …
WebRon Klain was the White House chief of staff and assistant to the president in the Biden administration. On January 22, 2024, multiple outlets reported that Klain planned to step down as chief of staff and would be replaced by Jeff Zients. Joe Biden announced Klain's appointment on November 11, 2024. [1]
WebNov 8, 2009 · Bill Clinton (1946-), the 42nd U.S. president, served in office from 1993 to 2001. In 1998, the House of Representatives impeached Clinton on charges related to a sexual relationship he had with ... gamestop website downWebJun 28, 1994 · President Clinton yesterday announced the second major shake-up of his administration, replacing White House Chief of Staff Thomas F. "Mack" McLarty with … blackhat websiteWebApr 15, 2016 · Podesta’s credentials as both a political insider and a UFO advocate are sterling. He was White House chief of staff at the end of President Bill Clinton’s second term and, more recently, a ... black hat wall rack multipleWebHillary Clinton: Vice President: Albert Gore, Jr. Secretary of State: Warren M. Christopher (1993–1997) Secretary of State: Madeleine Albright (1997–2001) Secretary of Defense: … black hat vs luciferWebPresident Bill Clinton with joint chiefs of staff. Standing, left to right: Adm. Frank Kelso, Gen. Gordon Sullivan, Gen. Colin Powell, President Clinton, Sec. Les Aspin, Adm. … blackhatwhitebandWebOct 20, 1998 · Current Chief of Staff Erskine Bowles will step aside at the end of October. Mr. Clinton described Podesta, a Chicago native, as a "strong manager and a skilled … black hat wattpadWebOct 10, 2016 · In a separate email, Clinton campaign chief Podesta also knocked a big Clinton booster, David Brock, a conservative-turned-liberal advocate, for bringing up Bernie Sanders’ health records.... black hat website